Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023013

EP2023013 - Hydrostatic stepless toothed transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.02.2016
Database last updated on 25.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG, CY, HU, SE, TR
published on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wieckowski, Henryk
ul. Maratonska 87c m. 28
94-007 Lodz / PL
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Wieckowski, Henryk
ul. Maratonska 87c m28
94-007 Lodz / PL
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Ciupinski, Zbigniew
Kancelaria Prawno-Patentowa
Ul. Stary Rynek 97/100
61-773 Poznan / PL
[2012/01]
Application number, filing date08013957.904.08.2008
[2009/07]
Priority number, datePL2007038310007.08.2007         Original published format: PL 38310007
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2023013
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2023013
Date:30.03.2011
[2011/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2023013
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:F16H39/36, F04C14/18
[2011/13]
Former International [2009/07]F16H39/24
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
TitleGerman:Stufenlos gezahntes hydrostatisches Getriebe[2009/07]
English:Hydrostatic stepless toothed transmission[2009/07]
French:Transmission dentée à variation continue hydrostatique[2009/07]
Examination procedure29.09.2011Examination requested  [2011/45]
15.12.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
13.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.06.2014Fee for grant paid
23.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.03.2012
Opposition(s)11.01.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/11]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
14.02.2012Request for further processing filed
14.02.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.02.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
28.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
25.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201003   M06   Fee paid on   11.02.2011
31.08.201104   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.2012
31.08.201407   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2015
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.08.2008
AT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
BG08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
TR08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IE04.08.2015
LU04.08.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2017/22]AT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IE04.08.2015
LU04.08.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/37]AT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IE04.08.2015
LU04.08.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/33]AT08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IE04.08.2015
LU04.08.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/24]AT08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
LU04.08.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/22]AT08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
LU04.08.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/18]AT08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
LU04.08.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/17]AT08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
LU04.08.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/10]AT08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/09]AT08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/07]AT08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/50]ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/49]ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/42]NL08.04.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]BE443167  (E.DELETAILLE) [X] 1-8 * pages 15,16; figures 7-16 *;
 [XA]DE10117139  (SCHIPPER THOMAS [DE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3-8;
 [XA]DE10164748  (SCHIPPER THOMAS [DE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3-8;
 [A]GB798214  (HORACE WARREN HASTINGS HODGKIN) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE759938  (WINKLER HANS JOACHIM DIPL-ING) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
by applicantPL315748
 PL316379
 PL316634
 PL317329
 PL317405
 PL443167B