EP1233343 - Method and radio interface layer comprising a set of application programming interfaces (APIs) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2002/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shell, Scott R. 8500 148th Avenue NE, Apt.D1012 Redmond Washington 98052 / US | 02 /
Sherman, Roman 604 122nd Avenue NE Bellevue Washington 98005 / US | 03 /
Shen, Alan W. 8216 Corliss Avenue N. Seattle Washington 98103 / US | [2002/34] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02003607.5 | 15.02.2002 | [2002/34] | Priority number, date | US20010788317 | 16.02.2001 Original published format: US 788317 | [2002/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1233343 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1233343 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | [2002/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1233343 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/10, H04L29/08, H04L29/06 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
H04L67/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Funkschnittstellenschicht bestehend aus einer Menge von Anwendungsprogrammierungsschnittstellen (APIs) | [2002/34] | English: | Method and radio interface layer comprising a set of application programming interfaces (APIs) | [2002/34] | French: | Procédé et une couche d'interface radio composes d'un ensemble des interfaces de programmation des applications (APIs) | [2002/44] |
Former [2002/34] | Procédé et une couche d'interface radio composés d'un ensemble des interfaces de programmation des applications (APIs) | Examination procedure | 15.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/34] | 14.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2006 | BE | 23.08.2006 | CH | 23.08.2006 | CY | 23.08.2006 | FI | 23.08.2006 | IT | 23.08.2006 | LI | 23.08.2006 | NL | 23.08.2006 | TR | 23.08.2006 | DK | 23.11.2006 | SE | 23.11.2006 | GR | 24.11.2006 | ES | 04.12.2006 | PT | 24.01.2007 | IE | 15.02.2007 | LU | 15.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CY | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 15.02.2007 | ||
LU | 15.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 15.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 15.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9606393 (ARCADA SOFTWARE INC [US]) [Y] 7,9,17 * page 1, line 4 - page 1, line 10 * * page 2, line 33 - page 7, line 15 * * page 8, line 26 - page 11, line 8 * * figure 2 * * abstract *; | [Y]US6018571 (LANGLOIS MICHAEL [CA], et al) [Y] 25 * column 5, line 22 - column 6, line 53 * * figure 2A *; | [XY]EP0994614 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,11-14,18-23,27,29-32 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 7 * * page 3, line 22 - page 9, line 14 * * page 10, line 1 - page 24, line 11 * * figures 1-8 * * abstract * [Y] 3,7,9,10,17,24-26,28; | [Y]US6141564 (BRUNER JOHN DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 26 * column 3, line 7 - column 5, line 8 * * figure 2 *; | [Y] - TSO M M ET AL, "Always on, always connected mobile computing", UNIVERSAL PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS, 1996. RECORD., 1996 5TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CAMBRIDGE, MA, USA 29 SEPT.-2 OCT. 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19960929), ISBN 0-7803-3300-4, pages 918 - 924, XP010198555 [Y] 3,10,24 * abstract * * page 918, column R, line 10 - page 918, column R, line 21 * * page 920, column L, line 37 - page 921, column L, line 57 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICUPC.1996.562712 | [Y] - STEEMAN H, "WIRELESS APPLICATION PROTOCOL (WAP)", ELEKTOR ELECTRONICS, ELEKTOR PUBLISHERS LTD. CANTERBURY, GB, (20000601), vol. 26, no. 289, ISSN 0268-4519, pages 56 - 58, XP001011722 [Y] 28 * page 57, column L, line 54 - page 58, column L, line L * |