Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0990387


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.02.2000 Renewal fee
11.02.2000 Change - extension states
18.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
04.08.2000 Publication of search report published on  20.09.2000 [2000/38]
19.01.2001 Request for examination filed published on  07.03.2001 [2001/10]
01.02.2001 Renewal fee
20.04.2001 Definitive list of designations published on  06.06.2001 [2001/23]
19.02.2002 Communication of intention to grant
22.02.2002 First examination report
15.03.2002 Renewal fee
17.04.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.04.2002 Communication of intention to grant
09.08.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.08.2002 (Expected) grant published on  02.10.2002  [2002/40]
19.06.2003 Unpublished change to opponent data
20.06.2003 Opposition filed published on  06.08.2003  [2003/32]
09.07.2003 Unpublished change to opponent data
11.07.2003 Opposition filed published on  27.08.2003  [2003/35]
05.08.2003 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
19.09.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.11.2003  [2003/45]
21.11.2003 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  07.01.2004  [2004/02]
03.12.2003 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
28.01.2004 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.07.2004 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
17.09.2004 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
31.05.2005 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
31.05.2005 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.07.2005 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
26.07.2005 Change: Appeal number
05.10.2005 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
05.10.2005 Change: Appeal number
13.01.2006 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  01.03.2006  [2006/09]
09.11.2007 Change: Date of oral proceedings
23.11.2007 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  26.12.2007  [2007/52]
14.02.2008 Change: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.03.2008 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
11.04.2008 Revocation of patent published on  14.05.2008  [2008/20]
11.07.2008 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  13.08.2008  [2008/33]