blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1098576


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.04.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  16.06.2004  [2004/25]
05.01.2004 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
02.07.2003 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
23.07.2002 Change - extension states
13.06.2002 Renewal fee
08.05.2001 Amendment by applicant
04.05.2001 Request for preliminary examination
05.04.2001 Request for preliminary examination
30.03.2001 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.05.2001 [2001/20]
30.03.2001 Request for examination filed published on  16.05.2001 [2001/20]
05.03.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
26.02.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
07.12.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
04.12.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
19.09.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
12.07.2000 PCT data prior to European publication