blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1098576


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.07.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
19.09.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
04.12.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
07.12.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
26.02.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
05.03.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
30.03.2001 Request for examination filed published on  16.05.2001 [2001/20]
30.03.2001 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.05.2001 [2001/20]
05.04.2001 Request for preliminary examination
04.05.2001 Request for preliminary examination
08.05.2001 Amendment by applicant
13.06.2002 Renewal fee
23.07.2002 Change - extension states
02.07.2003 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
05.01.2004 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
30.04.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  16.06.2004  [2004/25]