blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1100274


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.02.2001 Request for accelerated examination
28.03.2001 Renewal fee
30.03.2001 Request for examination filed published on  16.05.2001 [2001/20]
30.03.2001 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.05.2001 [2001/20]
13.04.2001 Publication of search report published on  30.05.2001 [2001/22]
20.07.2001 Request for accelerated examination
20.07.2001 Examination report or reply
28.07.2001 First examination report
04.12.2001 Renewal fee
06.12.2001 Examination report or reply
04.01.2002 Definitive list of designations published on  20.02.2002  [2002/08]
12.02.2002 Application refused
06.12.2002 Renewal fee
05.12.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.05.2004 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
29.05.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.10.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
03.12.2004 Change - French title published on  19.01.2005  [2005/03]
03.12.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.01.2005 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
10.01.2005 Appeal number
01.04.2005 Change - divisional application(s) published on  18.05.2005  [2005/20]
13.04.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
13.04.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
05.10.2005 Change: Appeal number
25.11.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.02.2006 (Expected) grant published on  12.04.2006  [2006/15]
16.02.2007 No opposition filed within time limit published on  21.03.2007  [2007/12]
17.10.2008 Change - applicant published on  19.11.2008  [2008/47]
18.12.2009 Change - representative published on  20.01.2010  [2010/03]