blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1259756


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.06.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
12.09.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
20.09.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
03.10.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
09.08.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
09.08.2002 Change - extension states
09.08.2002 Amendment by applicant
11.10.2002 Request for examination filed published on  27.11.2002  [2002/48]
11.10.2002 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  27.11.2002  [2002/48]
05.03.2003 Renewal fee
06.03.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.03.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.10.2005 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.03.2006 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
30.03.2006 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
14.07.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  16.08.2006  [2006/33]