Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1255043


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.09.2002 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.11.2002  [2002/45]
16.04.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.07.2004 Publication of search report published on  08.09.2004  [2004/37]
08.04.2005 Definitive list of designations published on  25.05.2005  [2005/21]
15.04.2005 New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit
15.04.2005 New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit
01.06.2005 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
16.07.2005 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
19.11.2005 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  04.01.2006  [2006/01]