blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1265359


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.10.2002 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  11.12.2002  [2002/50]
02.01.2004 Publication of search report published on  18.02.2004  [2004/08]
27.02.2004 Request for examination filed published on  14.04.2004  [2004/16]
25.05.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.09.2004 Definitive list of designations published on  10.11.2004  [2004/46]
18.01.2005 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
18.01.2005 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
25.05.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.04.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.05.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.04.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.06.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.04.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.04.2010 First examination report
22.05.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.08.2010 New entry: Reply to examination report
03.12.2010 Change - applicant published on  05.01.2011  [2011/01]
16.05.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.05.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.07.2013 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
08.01.2014 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
18.04.2014 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  21.05.2014  [2014/21]