Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1416656


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.03.2004 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.05.2004  [2004/19]
20.08.2004 Publication of search report published on  06.10.2004  [2004/41]
15.04.2005 Request for examination filed published on  01.06.2005  [2005/22]
13.05.2005 Definitive list of designations published on  29.06.2005  [2005/26]
10.11.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.11.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.03.2007 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.03.2007 First examination report
20.04.2007 Change - applicant published on  23.05.2007  [2007/21]
30.05.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
08.11.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.01.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.05.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
11.11.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.11.2008 Change - representative published on  24.12.2008  [2008/52]
08.07.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.08.2009 New entry: Reply to examination report
07.11.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.11.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.11.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.11.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.02.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.11.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.02.2013 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
22.04.2013 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
22.04.2013 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
15.07.2013 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.07.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.11.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.11.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
29.11.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
06.12.2013 (Expected) grant published on  08.01.2014  [2014/02]
14.11.2014 No opposition filed within time limit published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]