Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1559772


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.02.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
23.02.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
24.05.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
14.05.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
23.05.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
04.06.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
11.06.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
17.06.2005 Request for examination filed published on  03.08.2005  [2005/31]
17.06.2005 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.08.2005  [2005/31]
03.11.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.01.2006 Change - extension states published on  22.02.2006  [2006/08]
03.11.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.11.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.06.2008 Change - representative published on  30.07.2008  [2008/31]
01.08.2008 Change - classification published on  03.09.2008  [2008/36]
01.08.2008 Supplementary search report published on  03.09.2008  [2008/36]
29.10.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.11.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.11.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.11.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.11.2008 First examination report
14.03.2009 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.05.2009 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.11.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.10.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.10.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.04.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.06.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
26.09.2012 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
26.10.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.01.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
25.01.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
01.02.2013 (Expected) grant published on  06.03.2013  [2013/10]
22.03.2013 Change - applicant published on  24.04.2013  [2013/17]
19.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2013  [2013/34]
02.08.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.09.2013  [2013/36]
09.08.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2013  [2013/37]
27.09.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.10.2013  [2013/44]
18.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2013  [2013/47]
25.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2013  [2013/48]
01.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2013  [2013/49]
08.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2013  [2013/50]
22.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2013  [2013/52]
13.12.2013 Opposition filed published on  15.01.2014  [2014/03]
14.01.2014 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
24.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
07.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.03.2014  [2014/11]
12.05.2014 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
16.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.06.2014  [2014/25]
18.07.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
01.08.2014 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
20.04.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
03.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
17.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
16.01.2016 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
03.02.2016 Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
03.02.2016 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
04.02.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
04.08.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.08.2016 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
30.09.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
30.09.2016 New entry: Appeal number
05.10.2016 Change: Appeal number
09.05.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
10.04.2018 Change: Appeal number
28.09.2018 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  31.10.2018  [2018/44]
19.11.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.11.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings