blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1457191


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.07.2004 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.09.2004  [2004/38]
13.08.2004 Change - inventor published on  29.09.2004  [2004/40]
13.08.2004 Publication of search report published on  29.09.2004  [2004/40]
01.04.2005 Request for examination filed published on  18.05.2005  [2005/20]
29.04.2005 Definitive list of designations published on  15.06.2005  [2005/24]
08.03.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.01.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.06.2007 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.06.2007 First examination report
19.10.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.02.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.03.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.07.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
25.07.2008 Change - classification published on  27.08.2008  [2008/35]
25.07.2008 Change - classification published on  27.08.2008  [2008/35]
12.08.2008 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.08.2008 Change - representative published on  01.10.2008  [2008/40]
02.01.2009 Change - inventor published on  04.02.2009  [2009/06]
16.01.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.01.2009 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
16.01.2009 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
16.01.2009 Change: Renewal fee paid
23.01.2009 (Expected) grant published on  25.02.2009  [2009/09]
31.07.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.09.2009  [2009/36]
28.08.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.09.2009  [2009/40]
09.10.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.11.2009  [2009/46]
16.10.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.11.2009  [2009/47]
06.11.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.12.2009  [2009/50]
13.11.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.12.2009  [2009/51]
01.01.2010 No opposition filed within time limit published on  03.02.2010  [2010/05]
29.01.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.03.2010  [2010/09]
05.02.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.03.2010  [2010/10]
21.05.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.06.2010  [2010/25]
25.06.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.07.2010  [2010/30]
12.11.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.12.2010  [2010/50]
22.04.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.05.2011  [2011/21]
08.07.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2011  [2011/32]
30.09.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.11.2011  [2011/44]
07.10.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.11.2011  [2011/45]