Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1587411


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.07.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
20.08.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
24.08.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
09.08.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
31.08.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.08.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
03.09.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
06.09.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
09.09.2005 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.10.2005  [2005/43]
31.03.2006 Change - extension states published on  17.05.2006  [2006/20]
17.01.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.07.2007 Publication of international search report published on  22.08.2007  [2007/34]
10.08.2007 Request for examination filed published on  12.09.2007  [2007/37]
15.02.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.02.2008 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
15.02.2008 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
14.03.2008 Change - classification published on  16.04.2008  [2008/16]
02.01.2009 Supplementary search report published on  04.02.2009  [2009/06]
03.03.2009 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
08.05.2009 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
04.09.2009 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  07.10.2009  [2009/41]
09.10.2009 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  11.11.2009  [2009/46]