blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1882219


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.06.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
17.11.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
06.12.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
27.03.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
30.05.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
09.10.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
13.10.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
31.10.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
18.12.2007 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
18.12.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
28.12.2007 Request for examination filed published on  30.01.2008  [2008/05]
28.12.2007 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.01.2008  [2008/05]
28.12.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
25.04.2008 Change - representative published on  28.05.2008  [2008/22]
12.06.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.07.2008 Change - representative published on  13.08.2008  [2008/33]
01.05.2009 First examination report
01.05.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.06.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.09.2009 Change - representative published on  28.10.2009  [2009/44]
20.10.2009 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
05.02.2010 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  10.03.2010  [2010/10]