Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2065524


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.05.2009 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.06.2009  [2009/23]
18.09.2009 Publication of search report published on  21.10.2009  [2009/43]
19.03.2010 Change - divisional application(s) published on  21.04.2010  [2010/16]
09.04.2010 Amendment by applicant
30.04.2010 Request for examination filed published on  02.06.2010  [2010/22]
28.05.2010 Definitive list of designations published on  30.06.2010  [2010/26]
03.12.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.12.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.04.2012 First examination report
21.04.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
31.08.2012 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.10.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
04.12.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.12.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.06.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.10.2015 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.12.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.07.2016 Change - classification published on  03.08.2016  [2016/31]
01.07.2016 Change - classification published on  03.08.2016  [2016/31]
21.07.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
07.11.2016 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
02.12.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.01.2017 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
14.03.2017 New entry: Appeal number
14.03.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
12.05.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
01.08.2017 Change: Appeal number
04.12.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.12.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.12.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid