Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2259998


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.10.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
30.10.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
02.03.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
27.09.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
26.10.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
06.11.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.11.2010 Request for examination filed published on  15.12.2010  [2010/50]
12.11.2010 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.12.2010  [2010/50]
21.12.2010 Amendment by applicant
05.03.2011 New entry: Observations by third parties
13.05.2011 New entry: Observations by third parties
10.06.2011 Change - extension states published on  13.07.2011  [2011/28]
01.07.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.02.2012 Change - applicant published on  14.03.2012  [2012/11]
29.06.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.07.2012 New entry: Observations by third parties
19.10.2012 First examination report
19.10.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.02.2013 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.04.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
04.07.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.07.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.07.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.02.2017 New entry: Observations by third parties
15.02.2017 Change - representative
06.10.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
26.03.2018 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
29.06.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]