blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2105439


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.07.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.08.2009 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.09.2009  [2009/40]
26.03.2010 Request for examination filed published on  28.04.2010  [2010/17]
09.04.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.04.2010 Amendment by applicant
15.03.2011 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.04.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.08.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
01.08.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
16.09.2011 (Expected) grant published on  19.10.2011  [2011/42]
13.04.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.05.2012  [2012/20]
21.04.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2012  [2012/21]
04.05.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2012  [2012/23]
11.05.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2012  [2012/24]
18.05.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2012  [2012/25]
08.06.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2012  [2012/28]
20.07.2012 Opposition filed published on  22.08.2012  [2012/34]
20.07.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2012  [2012/34]
27.08.2012 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
11.12.2012 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
22.02.2013 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.06.2013 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
14.06.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.07.2013  [2013/29]
26.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.08.2013  [2013/35]
17.02.2014 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.02.2014 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
14.03.2014 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  16.04.2014  [2014/16]
25.03.2014 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
25.03.2014 New entry: Appeal number
28.03.2014 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  30.04.2014  [2014/18]
29.03.2014 Change: Appeal number
18.04.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.05.2014  [2014/21]
14.05.2014 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
18.07.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
26.09.2014 Change - representative published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
09.06.2017 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  12.07.2017  [2017/28]
10.04.2018 Change: Appeal number
04.09.2018 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.09.2018 Change: Date of oral proceedings
02.02.2019 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
02.02.2019 Change: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
05.02.2019 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.04.2019 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
19.04.2019 Revocation of patent published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]