blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2350012


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.04.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
30.04.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
10.09.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
29.04.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
27.05.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
15.06.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
01.07.2011 Request for examination filed published on  03.08.2011  [2011/31]
01.07.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.08.2011  [2011/31]
28.10.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.12.2011 Change - extension states published on  11.01.2012  [2012/02]
15.12.2011 Amendment by applicant
16.12.2011 Change - representative published on  18.01.2012  [2012/03]
21.09.2012 Change - classification published on  24.10.2012  [2012/43]
21.09.2012 Change - classification published on  24.10.2012  [2012/43]
21.09.2012 Supplementary search report published on  24.10.2012  [2012/43]
30.10.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.04.2013 Amendment by applicant
17.07.2013 Amendment by applicant
30.07.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.08.2013 First examination report
05.11.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.11.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
30.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.02.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.04.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.08.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.11.2015 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.01.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
04.07.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.08.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
07.09.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
31.10.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.01.2017 Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.02.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
19.05.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
19.05.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
19.05.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
26.05.2017 (Expected) grant published on  28.06.2017  [2017/26]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
08.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
16.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
04.05.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
15.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
03.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.09.2018  [2018/36]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
11.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.11.2019 [2019/46]