blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2378444


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.09.2011 First examination report
16.09.2011 Request for examination filed published on  19.10.2011  [2011/42]
23.11.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.10.2011  [2011/42]
06.03.2012 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
08.05.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.05.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.08.2013 Change - representative published on  11.09.2013  [2013/37]
01.11.2013 Change - representative published on  04.12.2013  [2013/49]
07.05.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.01.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.02.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
27.02.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.05.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.06.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
19.06.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
22.06.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
22.06.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
26.06.2015 (Expected) grant published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
15.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
22.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.02.2016  [2016/08]
29.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.03.2016  [2016/09]
05.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
12.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
04.03.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.04.2016  [2016/14]
15.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
22.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
29.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
06.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2016  [2016/23]
03.06.2016 No opposition filed within time limit published on  06.07.2016  [2016/27]
05.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.09.2016  [2016/36]
12.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.09.2016  [2016/37]
23.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.01.2017  [2017/04]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
15.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
13.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]