blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2469797


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.05.2012 Request for examination filed published on  27.06.2012  [2012/26]
27.06.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  27.06.2012  [2012/26]
04.01.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.01.2013 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
28.01.2013 Amendment by applicant
29.01.2013 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
05.02.2013 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
09.01.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.03.2015 Change - representative
13.03.2015 Change - representative
29.04.2015 Change - representative
12.06.2015 First examination report
12.06.2015 Change - representative
22.06.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.10.2015 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.11.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
04.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.12.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.03.2018 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.06.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.06.2018 Change - classification published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
22.06.2018 Change - classification published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
13.07.2018 Change - French title published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
13.07.2018 Change - English title published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
13.07.2018 Change - German title published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
15.07.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.11.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
29.11.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
29.11.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
21.12.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.12.2018 (Expected) grant published on  30.01.2019  [2019/05]
12.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
26.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
16.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
23.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.09.2019 [2019/39]