Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2681713


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.04.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
08.08.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
08.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
21.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
24.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
11.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
29.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
06.12.2013 Request for examination filed published on  08.01.2014  [2014/02]
06.12.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.01.2014  [2014/02]
03.04.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.05.2014 Amendment by applicant
09.05.2014 Change - extension states published on  11.06.2014  [2014/24]
05.12.2014 Change - inventor published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
27.03.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.05.2016 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
26.10.2016 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
27.01.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]