blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2793700


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
04.01.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
05.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
14.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
27.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
01.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
26.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
16.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.01.2015 Amendment by applicant
20.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  25.03.2015  [2015/13]
04.09.2015 First examination report
14.09.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.12.2015 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.02.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.10.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.12.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.02.2017 Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.03.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
06.03.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
10.03.2017 Change - French title published on  12.04.2017  [2017/15]
13.03.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
24.03.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
31.03.2017 (Expected) grant published on  03.05.2017  [2017/18]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
08.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
09.03.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
21.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]