Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2797678


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
29.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
07.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
05.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
19.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
01.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
31.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
03.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
13.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  08.04.2015  [2015/15]
14.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.03.2016 First examination report
05.04.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.08.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
02.12.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.12.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.04.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.06.2017 Change - inventor
22.06.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
10.10.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
12.10.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
12.10.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
13.10.2017 (Expected) grant published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
27.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.05.2018  [2018/22]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
10.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
31.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
07.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
14.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
21.09.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
21.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]