blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2806451


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
06.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
14.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.08.2014 Amendment by applicant
26.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
24.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
24.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
06.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.03.2015 Amendment by applicant
20.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
27.03.2015 Change - inventor published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
31.07.2015 Change - applicant published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
23.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.04.2016 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
15.04.2016 Change - classification published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
15.04.2016 Change - classification published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
18.11.2016 Amendment by applicant
16.12.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.12.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.12.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.04.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.04.2019 First examination report
03.08.2019 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.08.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report