Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2757466


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]
30.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.10.2019  [2019/40]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
05.04.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
14.12.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.01.2019  [2019/03]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
02.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
25.05.2018 Change - divisional application(s) published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
27.04.2018 (Expected) grant published on  30.05.2018  [2018/22]
26.03.2018 Change - representative
26.03.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
13.03.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
13.03.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
31.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.01.2018 New entry: Observations by third parties
10.12.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.10.2017 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
15.06.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.06.2017 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.01.2017 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
26.07.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
25.03.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.03.2016 Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.03.2016 Change - representative
30.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.01.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.10.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.07.2015 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
27.03.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.03.2015 First examination report
04.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.09.2014 Change - designated states published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
12.09.2014 Change - request for examination published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
11.09.2014 Amendment by applicant
22.08.2014 Change - representative published on  24.09.2014  [2014/39]
22.07.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  23.07.2014  [2014/30]
20.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  23.07.2014  [2014/30]