Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2814985


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
06.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
19.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
16.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
17.09.2014 Amendment by applicant
19.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
21.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
21.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
14.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.03.2015 Change - PCT data published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
27.03.2015 Change - classification published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
27.03.2015 Change - classification published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
15.01.2016 Change - extension states published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
12.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.02.2016 Change - classification published on  30.03.2016  [2016/13]
26.02.2016 Change - classification published on  30.03.2016  [2016/13]
03.03.2016 Supplementary search report published on  30.03.2016  [2016/13]
10.10.2016 Amendment by applicant
14.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.02.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.03.2018 First examination report
22.03.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.05.2018 Withdrawal of application published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]