Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2882747


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
13.11.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
01.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
13.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.03.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
14.03.2015 Change - representative
18.03.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
19.03.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
11.04.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
15.05.2015 Request for examination filed published on  17.06.2015  [2015/25]
15.05.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.06.2015  [2015/25]
12.08.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.09.2015 Amendment by applicant
16.10.2015 Change - extension states published on  18.11.2015  [2015/47]
20.12.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.03.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
16.03.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
16.03.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
25.03.2016 (Expected) grant published on  27.04.2016  [2016/17]
25.05.2016 Change - representative
27.05.2016 Change - applicant published on  29.06.2016  [2016/26]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
25.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
24.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
03.03.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  05.04.2017  [2017/14]
15.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.06.2017  [2017/23]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
13.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]