Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2897551


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
04.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
23.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.11.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
25.04.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
25.04.2015 Change - representative
29.04.2015 Amendment by applicant
29.04.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
20.05.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
26.06.2015 Request for examination filed published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
26.06.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
11.09.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  14.10.2015  [2015/42]
11.09.2015 Change - classification published on  14.10.2015  [2015/42]
11.09.2015 Change - classification published on  14.10.2015  [2015/42]
09.10.2015 First examination report
21.10.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.02.2016 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.03.2016 Change - extension states published on  06.04.2016  [2016/14]
18.04.2016 Change - representative
25.04.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
02.12.2016 Change - classification published on  04.01.2017  [2017/01]
02.12.2016 Change - classification published on  04.01.2017  [2017/01]
16.12.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.12.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.04.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
28.04.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
02.05.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
09.06.2017 Change - divisional application(s) published on  12.07.2017  [2017/28]
15.06.2017 (Expected) grant published on  07.06.2017  [2017/23]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
08.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
16.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
13.04.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  16.05.2018  [2018/20]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
21.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
22.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2019  [2019/52]