blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2873329


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
31.10.2014 Change - representative
17.04.2015 Request for examination filed published on  20.05.2015  [2015/21]
19.05.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  20.05.2015  [2015/21]
15.10.2015 Change - representative
26.11.2015 Amendment by applicant
26.11.2015 Change - representative
18.03.2016 First examination report
28.03.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
07.07.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
20.08.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.12.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.12.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.03.2017 Change - French title published on  05.04.2017  [2017/14]
03.03.2017 Change - English title published on  05.04.2017  [2017/14]
03.03.2017 Change - German title published on  05.04.2017  [2017/14]
21.03.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
07.04.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
07.04.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
07.04.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
14.04.2017 (Expected) grant published on  17.05.2017  [2017/20]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
23.03.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  25.04.2018  [2018/17]
15.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
03.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.09.2018  [2018/36]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]