Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3307077


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.06.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
16.12.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
21.12.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
09.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
09.01.2018 Change - representative
16.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
03.02.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
21.02.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
16.03.2018 Request for examination filed published on  18.04.2018  [2018/16]
16.03.2018 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
16.03.2018 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.04.2018  [2018/16]
13.06.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.07.2018 Amendment by applicant
17.08.2018 Change - extension states published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
17.08.2018 Change: Validation states published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
09.11.2018 First examination report
16.11.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.03.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
17.06.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.06.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.09.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
26.09.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent