blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3332552


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.01.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
16.06.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
11.07.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
23.10.2017 New entry: Observations by third parties
01.11.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
08.11.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
28.02.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
28.02.2018 Change - representative
06.03.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
29.03.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
11.05.2018 Request for examination filed published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
11.05.2018 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
11.05.2018 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
01.11.2018 New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit
01.11.2018 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
05.02.2019 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
08.02.2019 Change - extension states published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
08.02.2019 Change: Validation states published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
15.02.2019 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]