Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3463793


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.07.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
01.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
08.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
23.11.2018 Amendment by applicant
23.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
23.11.2018 Change - representative
12.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
12.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
04.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
08.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
08.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.04.2019 Change - representative
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
10.04.2019 Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
26.04.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.07.2019 Change - extension states published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019 Change: Validation states published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
29.07.2019 Amendment by applicant