Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3468268


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.10.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
31.10.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
18.08.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
07.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
07.01.2019 Change - representative
15.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
17.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
07.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
08.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
08.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
29.04.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.11.2019 Change - extension states published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]
15.11.2019 Change: Validation states published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]