Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3473880


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.10.2018 Change - representative
22.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
28.10.2019 Amendment by applicant
01.11.2019 Change - designated states published on  04.12.2019  [2019/49]
01.11.2019 Request for examination filed published on  04.12.2019  [2019/49]
01.11.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
18.11.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.11.2019 First examination report
25.11.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.12.2019 Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.12.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.12.2019 First examination report