Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3473291
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
23.05.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.05.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.08.2021 |
Change - inventor |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
21.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.08.2020 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
22.05.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.10.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.05.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.05.2019 |
Change - inventor |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
10.04.2019 |
Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
22.03.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
22.03.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
22.03.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
07.12.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.12.2018 |
Change - representative |
|