Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3473291


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.12.2018 Change - representative
07.12.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
22.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
03.05.2019 Change - inventor published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
24.05.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.10.2019 Amendment by applicant