blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0647711


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.02.1995 Request for examination filed published on  12.04.1995 [1995/15]
24.02.1995 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.04.1995 [1995/15]
03.03.1995 Change - inventor published on  26.04.1995 [1995/17]
26.09.1996 Renewal fee
01.10.1997 Renewal fee
01.10.1998 Renewal fee
01.10.1999 Renewal fee
14.04.2000 Change - applicant published on  31.05.2000 [2000/22]
09.05.2000 Examination report or reply
12.05.2000 First examination report
04.08.2000 Change - applicant published on  20.09.2000 [2000/38]
18.09.2000 Examination report or reply
29.09.2000 Renewal fee
07.12.2000 Examination report or reply
14.12.2000 Examination report or reply
02.05.2001 Examination report or reply
27.09.2001 Renewal fee
03.06.2002 Communication of intention to grant
04.10.2002 Renewal fee
15.11.2002 Change - applicant published on  02.01.2003  [2003/01]
11.12.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.12.2002 Communication of intention to grant
21.03.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.03.2003 Change - representative published on  14.05.2003  [2003/20]
28.03.2003 Change - representative published on  14.05.2003  [2003/20]
15.04.2003 Change - inventor published on  28.05.2003  [2003/22]
18.04.2003 (Expected) grant published on  04.06.2003  [2003/23]
14.11.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.01.2004  [2004/01]
21.11.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.01.2004  [2004/02]
28.11.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.01.2004  [2004/03]
19.01.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.03.2004  [2004/10]
09.04.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  26.05.2004  [2004/22]
16.04.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.06.2004  [2004/23]
21.05.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.07.2004  [2004/28]
06.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.09.2004  [2004/39]
17.09.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.11.2004  [2004/45]
17.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
28.12.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.01.2008  [2008/05]