blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0661028


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.05.1995 Request for examination filed published on  05.07.1995 [1995/27]
19.05.1995 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.07.1995 [1995/27]
23.05.1995 Change - representative published on  12.07.1995 [1995/28]
10.01.1997 Renewal fee
15.01.1998 Renewal fee
13.01.1999 Renewal fee
29.10.1999 Examination report or reply
05.11.1999 First examination report
17.01.2000 Renewal fee
15.03.2000 Examination report or reply
17.05.2000 Examination report or reply
26.09.2000 Examination report or reply
11.01.2001 Renewal fee
21.02.2001 Examination report or reply
22.02.2001 Examination report or reply
17.04.2001 Examination report or reply
14.11.2001 Communication of intention to grant
16.01.2002 Renewal fee
28.03.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.03.2002 Communication of intention to grant
09.05.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.08.2002 Change - classification published on  18.09.2002  [2002/38]
02.08.2002 Change - classification published on  18.09.2002  [2002/38]
09.08.2002 (Expected) grant published on  25.09.2002  [2002/39]
02.08.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  17.09.2003  [2003/38]