blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0701316


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.01.1996 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  13.03.1996 [1996/11]
09.01.1997 Renewal fee
07.03.1997 Publication of search report published on  23.04.1997 [1997/17]
20.06.1997 Request for examination filed published on  06.08.1997 [1997/32]
09.02.1998 Renewal fee
27.04.1998 Examination report or reply
30.04.1998 First examination report
11.09.1998 Examination report or reply
22.01.1999 Renewal fee
08.04.1999 Communication of intention to grant
14.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
14.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant
22.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.01.2000 Renewal fee
24.03.2000 (Expected) grant published on  10.05.2000 [2000/19]
17.03.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  02.05.2001 [2001/18]
23.11.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.01.2002  [2002/02]
09.05.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2002  [2002/26]