blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0706951


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.03.1996 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.04.1996 [1996/16]
02.08.1996 Request for examination filed published on  18.09.1996 [1996/38]
21.10.1997 Renewal fee
23.04.1998 Examination report or reply
24.04.1998 First examination report
09.09.1998 Examination report or reply
19.10.1998 Renewal fee
02.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant
17.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant
18.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.10.1999 Renewal fee
18.02.2000 (Expected) grant published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
02.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  21.03.2001 [2001/12]
30.11.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.01.2002  [2002/03]
08.02.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2002  [2002/13]
22.02.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.04.2002  [2002/15]
08.03.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.04.2002  [2002/17]
31.05.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.07.2002  [2002/29]
30.08.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.10.2002  [2002/42]
19.09.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.11.2003  [2003/45]
09.01.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.02.2004  [2004/09]
21.05.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.07.2004  [2004/28]
06.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.09.2004  [2004/39]
13.06.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.07.2008  [2008/29]