blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0777579


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.03.1996 PCT data prior to European publication
12.08.1996 PCT data prior to European publication
20.03.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
02.04.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
16.04.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
25.04.1997 Request for examination filed published on  11.06.1997 [1997/24]
25.04.1997 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  11.06.1997 [1997/24]
03.07.1997 Renewal fee
22.01.1998 Examination report or reply
23.01.1998 First examination report
08.06.1998 Examination report or reply
09.07.1998 Renewal fee
31.07.1998 Examination report or reply
16.12.1998 Examination report or reply
20.04.1999 Communication of intention to grant
02.07.1999 Renewal fee
08.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant
11.01.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
03.03.2000 (Expected) grant published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
16.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  04.04.2001 [2001/14]
25.07.2008 Change - representative published on  27.08.2008  [2008/35]