blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0813379


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.05.1996 PCT data prior to European publication
19.10.1996 PCT data prior to European publication
05.09.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
17.09.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
07.11.1997 Request for examination filed published on  29.12.1997 [1997/52]
07.11.1997 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.12.1997 [1997/52]
02.03.1998 Renewal fee
27.10.1998 Examination report or reply
30.10.1998 First examination report
03.03.1999 Renewal fee
05.03.1999 Examination report or reply
30.03.1999 Communication of intention to grant
10.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
10.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant
14.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
03.12.1999 (Expected) grant published on  19.01.2000 [2000/03]
25.10.2000 Unpublished change to opponent data
27.10.2000 Opposition filed published on  13.12.2000 [2000/50]
21.11.2000 Observations of proprietor on opposition
27.03.2001 Observations of proprietor on opposition
06.06.2001 Observations of proprietor on opposition
06.06.2001 Observations of proprietor to parties involved
02.10.2001 Observations of proprietor to parties involved
22.01.2002 Change - oral proceedings
20.06.2002 Change - oral proceedings
20.06.2002 Interlocutory decision in opposition
13.09.2002 Change - representative published on  30.10.2002  [2002/44]
13.09.2002 Change - applicant published on  30.10.2002  [2002/44]
04.10.2002 Interlocutory decision in opposition
09.10.2002 Communication/fee (R.58(5) EPC1973)
22.01.2003 Communication/fee (R.58(5) EPC1973)
31.01.2003 Patent maintained (B2 publication) published on  19.03.2003  [2003/12]