blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0814664


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.05.1996 PCT data prior to European publication
22.10.1996 PCT data prior to European publication
06.11.1996 PCT data prior to European publication
21.10.1997 Change - extension states
21.10.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
10.11.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
21.11.1997 Request for examination filed published on  07.01.1998 [1998/02]
21.11.1997 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  07.01.1998 [1998/02]
25.02.1998 Renewal fee
23.02.1999 Renewal fee
08.03.1999 Communication of intention to grant
12.03.1999 First examination report
01.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant
09.07.1999 Change - applicant published on  25.08.1999 [1999/34]
15.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant
16.07.1999 Change - German title published on  01.09.1999 [1999/35]
12.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.10.1999 Change - representative published on  08.12.1999 [1999/49]
03.12.1999 (Expected) grant published on  19.01.2000 [2000/03]
24.10.2000 Unpublished change to opponent data
27.10.2000 Opposition filed published on  13.12.2000 [2000/50]
17.11.2000 Observations of proprietor on opposition
30.03.2001 Observations of proprietor on opposition
27.04.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2001 [2001/24]
31.05.2001 Observations of proprietor on opposition
01.06.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2001 [2001/29]
30.10.2001 Change - oral proceedings
11.01.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2003  [2003/09]
28.01.2003 Opposition rejected
28.01.2003 Change - oral proceedings
07.03.2003 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  23.04.2003  [2003/17]
07.03.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.04.2003  [2003/17]
14.03.2003 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  02.05.2003  [2003/18]
03.04.2003 Change - appeal
04.04.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.05.2003  [2003/21]
13.06.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.07.2003  [2003/31]
26.06.2003 Change - appeal
26.09.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.11.2003  [2003/46]
06.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.09.2004  [2004/39]
10.01.2005 Appeal number
05.10.2005 Change: Appeal number
25.05.2006 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.05.2006 Change: Date of oral proceedings
05.01.2007 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.02.2007 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
16.03.2007 Opposition rejected published on  18.04.2007  [2007/16]
31.07.2009 Change - representative published on  02.09.2009  [2009/36]