blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0854856


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.03.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
23.04.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
03.10.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
06.03.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
25.03.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
12.06.1998 Request for examination filed published on  29.07.1998 [1998/31]
12.06.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.07.1998 [1998/31]
22.07.1998 Renewal fee
04.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant
11.06.1999 First examination report
03.08.1999 Renewal fee
26.08.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
26.08.1999 Communication of intention to grant
17.12.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.02.2000 (Expected) grant published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
02.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  21.03.2001 [2001/12]