blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0777038


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.04.1997 Request for examination filed published on  04.06.1997 [1997/23]
18.04.1997 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  04.06.1997 [1997/23]
20.06.1997 Publication of search report published on  06.08.1997 [1997/32]
30.01.1998 Renewal fee
26.08.1998 Examination report or reply
28.08.1998 First examination report
08.12.1998 Examination report or reply
05.02.1999 Change - German title published on  24.03.1999 [1999/12]
05.02.1999 Renewal fee
01.03.1999 Communication of intention to grant
25.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant
05.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.12.1999 Renewal fee
18.02.2000 (Expected) grant published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
02.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  21.03.2001 [2001/12]