blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0968479


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.04.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
18.11.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
13.01.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
28.09.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
08.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
12.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
19.11.1999 Request for examination filed published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
19.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
16.12.1999 Renewal fee
16.12.1999 Surcharge for renewal fee
15.03.2000 Renewal fee
30.01.2001 Renewal fee
21.03.2002 Renewal fee
19.03.2003 Renewal fee
08.04.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.12.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.04.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.05.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
20.05.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
27.05.2005 (Expected) grant published on  13.07.2005  [2005/28]
10.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2006  [2006/13]
17.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
24.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.04.2006  [2006/15]
19.05.2006 No opposition filed within time limit published on  21.06.2006  [2006/25]
19.05.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.06.2006  [2006/25]
26.05.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.06.2006  [2006/26]
04.08.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2006  [2006/36]
13.10.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2006  [2006/46]
23.03.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.04.2007  [2007/17]
11.01.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.02.2008  [2008/07]
28.11.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.12.2008  [2009/01]