blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0928967


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.05.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  14.07.1999 [1999/28]
31.03.2000 Publication of search report published on  17.05.2000 [2000/20]
17.11.2000 Request for examination filed published on  03.01.2001 [2001/01]
08.12.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  24.01.2001 [2001/04]
15.01.2001 Renewal fee
08.02.2001 Change - extension states
16.01.2002 Renewal fee
11.12.2002 Examination report or reply
13.12.2002 First examination report
31.01.2003 Surcharge for renewal fee
12.03.2003 Renewal fee
30.04.2003 Examination report or reply
02.07.2003 New entry: Examination report or reply
15.08.2003 Change - German title published on  01.10.2003  [2003/40]
27.08.2003 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.01.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.01.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
24.01.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
28.01.2004 Deletion: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
30.01.2004 (Expected) grant published on  17.03.2004  [2004/12]
21.01.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  09.03.2005  [2005/10]