Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0968855


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
25.02.2000 Change - representative published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
21.06.2000 Renewal fee
14.07.2000 Request for examination filed published on  30.08.2000 [2000/35]
28.07.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  13.09.2000 [2000/37]
25.09.2000 Change - extension states
21.11.2000 Examination report or reply
24.11.2000 First examination report
28.12.2000 Examination report or reply
09.01.2001 Examination report or reply
02.05.2001 Examination report or reply
29.05.2001 Examination report or reply
21.06.2001 Renewal fee
12.11.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn
02.03.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  17.04.2002  [2002/16]