Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0991236


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
20.07.2001 Change - classification published on  05.09.2001 [2001/36]
20.07.2001 Publication of search report published on  05.09.2001 [2001/36]
10.08.2001 Request for examination filed published on  26.09.2001 [2001/39]
15.10.2001 Renewal fee
05.04.2002 Definitive list of designations published on  22.05.2002  [2002/21]
08.04.2002 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
21.06.2002 Loss of particular rights
06.08.2002 Change - extension states
07.10.2002 Loss of particular rights
09.10.2002 Renewal fee
09.10.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.06.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.06.2004 First examination report
06.10.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.10.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.12.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
08.07.2005 Deletion: Reply to examination report
08.07.2005 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.11.2005 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
28.12.2005 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
14.04.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  31.05.2006  [2006/22]
27.11.2009 Change - representative published on  30.12.2009  [2009/53]