Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0969358


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
05.04.2001 Renewal fee
19.04.2002 Renewal fee
22.11.2002 Publication of search report published on  08.01.2003  [2003/02]
14.03.2003 Request for examination filed published on  02.05.2003  [2003/18]
04.04.2003 Renewal fee
08.08.2003 Definitive list of designations published on  24.09.2003  [2003/39]
10.12.2003 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
10.12.2003 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
08.04.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.04.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.04.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.12.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.12.2006 First examination report
05.04.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.06.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
27.03.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.04.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.04.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.04.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.01.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.01.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.04.2014 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
29.10.2014 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
30.01.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]